THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 21:09:50 PM
Cohen-Silver, Justine Heather
CPSO#:
89205
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Paediatric Consult Clinic
3rd Floor Our lady of Mercy Wing
30 the Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6625
Fax: 416-530-6924
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Just for Kids Clinic,St. Joseph's Health Centre |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:16 Dec 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JUSTINE HEATHER COHEN-SILVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN-SILVER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 10 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Jan 2016
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2013 |