THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/09/23 7:08:11 AM
Costa Vitali, Atilio Eugenio
CPSO#:
89192
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Mar 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: National University of Tucuman, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Cardiology
Centre Tower 3rd Floor
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 3661
Fax: (705) 523-7081
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:10 Aug 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Aug 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Aug 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Aug 2023 |
|
Active |