skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/10/21 23:03:27 PM

Habib, Mohammad Ahsan

CPSO#: 89169

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Center
HDH Site
166 Brock Street
Centenary Wing - Level 5
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2550 Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:12 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD AHSAN HABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2014