THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/09/23 8:26:00 AM
Moore, Shannon Elizabeth
CPSO#:
89153
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2000 Credit Valley Rd #502
Mississauga ON L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 820-8748
Fax: 866-820-5299
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:31 Dec 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHANNON ELIZABETH MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 31 Dec 2011 to 30 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 31 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2014 |