THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
31/03/23 14:53:26 PM
Verbeeten, Katherine
CPSO#:
89123
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Houston, Katherine (used until: 06 Feb 2011 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kidcrew
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5R 3J3
Phone: 416-654-5437 Ext. 3939
Fax: 647-689-2371
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital,General Division |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:19 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATHERINE VERBEETEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERBEETEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jan 2017
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2016 |