THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:53:19 AM
Kearney, Sarah Alexandra
CPSO#:
89074
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Oct 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Oct 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
Division of Adolescent Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5804
Fax: (416) 813-5392
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:24 May 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Adolescent Medicine |
Effective:25 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH ALEXANDRA KEARNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEARNEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Oct 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2017 |