THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:48:43 PM
Doherty, Megan Elizabeth
CPSO#:
89046
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of East Ontario
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: (613) 523-3617
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Palliative Medicine |
Effective:29 Jul 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MEGAN ELIZABETH DOHERTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOHERTY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2012 |