skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/10/21 12:47:44 PM

Bourns, Amy Elizabeth

CPSO#: 89028

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Mar 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sherbourne Health
333 Sherbourne St.
Toronto ON  M5A 2S5
Phone: 6477303200
Fax: (416) 324-4181 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert Bourns Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMY ELIZABETH BOURNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURNS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 31 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2011