skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 14/08/22 12:43:44 PM

Zielinski, Dawid Krzysztof

CPSO#: 88979

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Manitoba, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1001 Boul Décarie
Montreal Children's Hospital
Division of Respiratory MEdicine
Montréal QC  H4A 3J1

Additional Practice Location(s)

525 University Ave
Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Respirology
Toronto ON  M5G 2L3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:16 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAWID KRZYSZTOF ZIELINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIELINSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2022