skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 4:59:13 AM

Kalechstein, Sara Margaret

CPSO#: 88938

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sara Kalechstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 25 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 101 1617 Baker Street Cranbrook, BC V1C 1B4
Date Received: 11 Aug 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2014