THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/09/23 13:16:09 PM
Backman, Stephanie Anne
CPSO#:
88932
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1800 8th St E
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: 5193712651
Fax: 5193716178
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE ANNE BACKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACKMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |