THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:25:32 AM
Moores, Daisy Elizabeth
CPSO#:
88930
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
700-1081 Carling Ave
Ottawa, On
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 563-3670
Fax: (613) 563-4124
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAISY ELIZABETH MOORES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2011 to 19 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |