THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 4:52:24 AM
Whippey, Amanda Joanne
CPSO#:
88924
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Cull, Amanda Joanne (used until: 28 Oct 2010 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 2A5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMANDA JOANNE WHIPPEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHIPPEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2013 |