skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/07/21 16:17:07 PM

Dong, Jihao

CPSO#: 88903

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jihao Dong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dong ( CPSO# 88903 )
Dr. M. Guo ( CPSO# 95947 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:21 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JIHAO DONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2014