skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/10/21 10:06:30 AM

Yudin, Jovana

CPSO#: 88882

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Feb 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
190 Sherway Drive, Suite 102
Toronto ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: 416-622-4762
Fax: 416-622-4763 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners
Medical Clinics, 2nd Floor
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: 416-521-4196
Fax: 416-521-4076
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jovana Yudin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yudin ( CPSO# 88882 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners - Q Site
Medical Clinics, 2nd Floor
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4196

Business Address:
Sherway Medical Clinic
Suite 102
190 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 622-4762

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:18 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOVANA YUDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUDIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2013