THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 10:15:34 AM
Toor, Sundeep Singh
CPSO#:
88869
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
P O Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Phone: 905-472-7373 Ext. 6649
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Geraldton District Hospital |
Geraldton |
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Fort Frances |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital |
Uxbridge |
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital |
Red Lake |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUNDEEP SINGH TOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOOR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |