THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:20:18 AM
Satkunasivam, Raj
CPSO#:
88851
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Satkunasivam, Nagarajeshwaran (used until: 03 Jan 2012 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Raj Satkunasivam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 26 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2017 |