THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/09/23 4:39:21 AM
Koblic, Paul Michael
CPSO#:
88820
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Mount Sinai Hospital Room 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5058
Fax: (416) 586-4719
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mount Sinai Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:19 Oct 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL MICHAEL KOBLIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOBLIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 21 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2010 |