THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:18:21 AM
Huynh, Nhu Nguyet
CPSO#:
88812
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3276 St Clair Ave E
Main building, Unit A5
Scarborough ON M1L 1W1
Phone: 4162853666 Ext. 3648
Fax: 4162853637
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Providence Health Care,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NHU NGUYET HUYNH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUYNH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2010 |