skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 11/08/22 23:03:47 PM

Colman, Rebecca Eve

CPSO#: 88784

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: 41634048005112
Fax: 4166461062 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca Colman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Colman ( CPSO# 88784 )

Business Address:
600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital Suite 6-207
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: 416 340-4800


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick
Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:09 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REBECCA EVE COLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 Jan 2015
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012