THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
06/12/23 12:07:00 PM
Aoun, Lawrence
CPSO#:
88768
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: 519-973-4411 Ext. 33319
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Lawrence Aoun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 19 2013
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jan 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Palliative Medicine |
Effective:25 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAWRENCE AOUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AOUN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Jan 2011 to 23 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2012 |