THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 2:41:26 AM
Schuler, Jane Elizabeth
CPSO#:
88756
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Murrin-Schuler, Jane Elizabeth (used until: 08 Dec 2015 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
210 Centrum Blvd
Orléans ON K1E 3V7
Phone: 613-837-5454
Fax: 613-837-3781
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Jane Schuler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JANE ELIZABETH SCHULER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHULER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2013 |