THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:38:28 PM
Rizk, Nada Nabil Anis
CPSO#:
88725
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Dec 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Dec 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, Armenian, English, French
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
135-690 Dorval Dr
Oakville ON L6K 3W7
Phone: 9058441751
Fax: 9059011633
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NADA NABIL ANIS RIZK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 03 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 04 May 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2010 |