THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 0:19:08 AM
Gupta, Alok
CPSO#:
88719
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Feb 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Jammu University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
34 Stone Church Rd
Ancaster ON L9K 1S5
Phone: 9055278708
Fax: 9055275798
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Dec 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALOK GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 26 Mar 2010
AVP - Medical Biochemistry
McMaster University, 27 Mar 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2013 |