THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:07:28 AM
Ahsan, Muhammad Rauf
CPSO#:
88665
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: Dow Medical College, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Foothills Medical Center
Rm C828
1403 - 29 St NW
Calgary AB T2N 2T9
Phone: (403) 944-2515
Fax: (403) 944-2906
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. M. Rauf Ahsan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 19 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:22 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD RAUF AHSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHSAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 11 Aug 2008
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 12 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jan 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2013 |