THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:31:24 AM
Ramien, Michele Louise
CPSO#:
88661
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 May 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Michele Ramien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Rd
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 15 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 May 2019 |