THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 19:02:24 PM
Luong, Vu
CPSO#:
88656
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Vietnamese
Education: McMaster University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Northwest Territories
Nunavut
Saskatchewan
Yukon
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VU LUONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2015 |