THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 14:53:52 PM
Lemay, Genevieve
CPSO#:
88654
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Lemay, Genevieve Marie Louise (used until: 07 Aug 2012 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 748-4929
Fax: 613-748-4995
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE LEMAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEMAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2012 |