THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:54:54 AM
Pitcher, Amanda Jennifer
CPSO#:
88635
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Oct 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Queen's University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 2022 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Apr 2023 |