skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/10/21 9:42:08 AM

Joshi, Anand Pradip

CPSO#: 88612

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 09 Jun 2008 to 29 Jun 2008
EL - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2009 to 21 Jun 2009
EL - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 22 Jun 2009 to 12 Jul 2009
EL - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 04 Sep 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
EL - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014