THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:46:42 AM
Gharajeh, Arash
CPSO#:
88605
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Queen's University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARASH GHARAJEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHARAJEH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Mar 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Mar 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2013 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2014 |