skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 23:52:28 PM

Molnar, Amber October

CPSO#: 88582

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 May 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3rd Floor Marian Wing
St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Ave East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33787
Fax: (905) 521-6153 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Amber Molnar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Molnar ( CPSO# 88582 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMBER OCTOBER MOLNAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLNAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2013