THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:06:36 AM
Varshney, Terry
CPSO#:
88567
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hindi
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hosp of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3955
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Emergency Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TERRY VARSHNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARSHNEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2014 to 06 Apr 2014
EL - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Apr 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2014 |