skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/05/22 1:59:08 AM

Dove, Carin Jeanne

CPSO#: 88505

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Dec 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Gouws, Carin Jeanne (used until: 20 Jan 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
202-106 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke-Brampton Sleep Clinic
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4E4
Phone: 416-742-0680
Fax: 416-742-0681 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

300-1100 Burloak Dr
Dove Medical Practice
Burlington ON  L7L 6B2
Canada
Phone: 365-737-3683
Fax: 365-364-3622
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: CARIN J. DOVE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dove ( CPSO# 88505 )

Business Address:
202-106 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4E4

Business Address:
300-1100 Burloak Dr
Burlington ON  L7L 6B2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CARIN JEANNE DOVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOVE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2013