THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 8:05:36 AM
Bhan, Sasha Neal
CPSO#:
88490
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
8 Richmond Park Dr
L.A.C.G. Hospital
Napanee ON K7R 2Z4
Phone: 6133543301
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Yukon
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial |
Trenton |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft |
Bancroft |
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site |
Picton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SASHA NEAL BHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 18 Jul 2011 to 17 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 18 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 18 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |