THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 0:36:55 AM
Grant, Brian Robert
CPSO#:
88479
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
QHC Belleville General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:26 Aug 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIAN ROBERT GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 17 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 18 Aug 2009 to 17 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 18 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 14 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 15 Oct 2011 to 14 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 15 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2013 |