THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:52:32 PM
Conrad, Tatiana Deirdre
CPSO#:
88449
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Apr 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521 Ext. 6595
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Tatiana Conrad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TATIANA DEIRDRE CONRAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONRAD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 24 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 25 Dec 2009 to 24 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 25 Dec 2010 to 24 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 25 Dec 2011 to 24 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 25 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 2014 |