skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 29/11/21 12:20:56 PM

McKinnon, Michelle Patricia

CPSO#: 88440

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Community Palliative
Medicine Associates
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7A1
Phone: 613 801 0035 Ext. 103
Fax: 613 801 0036 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hospice at Maycourt
114 Cameron Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 0X1
Canada
Phone: (613) 260-2906
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Ruddy Shenkman Hospice
110 McCurdy Dr
Kanata ON  K2L 2Z6
Canada
Phone: (613) 591-6002
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Michelle McKinnon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. McKinnon ( CPSO# 88440 )

Business Address:
Community Palliative Medicine Associates
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7A1
Phone Number: (613) 801-0035

Business Address:
Maycourt Hospice
114 Cameron Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 0X1
Phone Number: (613) 260-2906

Business Address:
110 McCurdy Drive
Ottawa ON  K2L 2Z6
Phone Number: (613) 591-6002

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHELLE PATRICIA MCKINNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKINNON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2011