skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 11/08/22 22:31:07 PM

Tiffney, Jennifer

CPSO#: 88432

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Feb 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health
St Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 53804
Fax: (905)3237598 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Health
Greater Niagara General Site
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 53804
Fax: (905) 323-7598
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

MedSleep
Suite 204
6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Canada
Phone: (905) 374-6453
Fax: (888) 905-6992
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tiffney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tiffney ( CPSO# 88432 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
St Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Site
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Niagara Snoring and Sleep Centre
Suite 204
6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone Number: (905) 374-6453

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:28 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER TIFFNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIFFNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2014