skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 2:23:18 AM

Chehadi, Waleed

CPSO#: 88431

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 207-9100
Fax: (519) 207-9200 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Waleed Chehadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Chehadi ( CPSO# 88431 )

Business Address:
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 207-9100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WALEED CHEHADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEHADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012