THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:59:56 AM
Parker, Kristy Alayne
CPSO#:
88425
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1600 Holland Cross
Tower B, 2nd Floor
Health Canada - Pharmaceutical Drug
Bureau of Medical Sciences, Medical
Ottawa ON K1A 0K9
Phone: 613-954-9165
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kristy Parker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KRISTY ALAYNE PARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |