THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 12:55:30 PM
Marriott, Jason James Austin
CPSO#:
88420
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Migration Health Branch
Immigration, Refugees and
Citizenship Canada
300 Slater Street
Ottawa ON K1A 1L1
Phone: (613) 437-5635
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Sep 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JASON JAMES AUSTIN MARRIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARRIOTT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2010 |