skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/07/21 10:37:08 AM

Tangri, Vikram

CPSO#: 88373

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Little Lake Terrace Suite 201
Barrie ON  L4M0H9
Phone: 7058819810
Fax: 7059153500 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vikram Tangri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Tangri ( CPSO# 88373 )

Business Address:
11 Lakeside Terrace Suite 201
Barrie ON  L4M H9
Phone Number: 7958819810

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:22 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VIKRAM TANGRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANGRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012