THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 0:30:33 AM
Taylor, James
CPSO#:
88364
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 May 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 May 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Hematology
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 6137378899 Ext. 73904
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: James Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 28 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Vancouver General Hospital, Floor 10, Leukemia BMT Program of BC, 2775 Laurel Street, Vancouver, BC V5Z 1M9
Date Received: 25 May 2015
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2019 |