skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 29/07/21 9:05:32 AM

Hinkkala, Kaarlo Samuel

CPSO#: 88341

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Finnish

Education:Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Hospitalist Office
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: 807-684-6001 Electoral District: 09

Additional Practice Location(s)

PRHC - Hospitalist Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: 705-743-2121 Ext. 3084
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Soldiers Memorial Hospital - Renal
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Canada
Phone: 705-325-9129
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

St. Joseph's Health Care London
Room B6-665
286 Grosvenor St
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6100 Ext. 64219
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kaarlo Hinkkala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hinkkala ( CPSO# 88341 )

Business Address:
Soldiers Memorial Hospital-Renal
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Hospitalist Office
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Hospitalist Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Suite B6-665
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAARLO SAMUEL HINKKALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HINKKALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Western University, 05 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Western University, 15 Sep 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2012