skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/07/21 13:21:46 PM

Harris, Luke

CPSO#: 88340

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1833 Cassells Street
North Bay ON  P1B 4C8
Phone: (705) 472-8577
Fax: (705) 472-3025 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. McKenna and L. Harris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Harris ( CPSO# 88340 )
Dr. A. McKenna ( CPSO# 88919 )

Business Address:
1833 Cassells Street
North Bay ON  P1B 4C8
Phone Number: (705) 472-8577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LUKE HARRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013