THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:47:43 AM
Guerin, Andrea Anne
CPSO#:
88337
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
76 Stuart St
Dept of Pediatrics, FAPC4
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: 6135496666 Ext. 2800
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Genetics and Genomics |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREA ANNE GUERIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUERIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |