THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:59:43 PM
Gazala, Khalid Walid George
CPSO#:
88318
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
Department of Neurology
3001 Hospital gate
Oakville ON L6M0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 6765
Fax: (905) 338-4372
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KHALID WALID GEORGE GAZALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAZALA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 23 Aug 2010 to 19 Sep 2010
EL - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Nov 2010 to 13 Dec 2010
EL - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2011 |