THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
06/06/23 2:11:39 AM
Al-Asaaed, Sohaib
CPSO#:
88316
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Dec 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
EL - Medical Oncology
Queen's University, 25 Aug 2008 to 21 Sep 2008
EL - Medical Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Medical Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Medical Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2013 |