THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 5:08:16 AM
Alshehhi, Maryam Hasan Abdulla Darwish
CPSO#:
88291
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
10 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Arabian Gulf University College of Medic, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 May 2008 to 23 Jun 2008
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 02 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 03 Oct 2009 to 02 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 03 Oct 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
McMaster University, 27 Aug 2013 to 10 Jan 2014
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 13 May 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Jan 2014 |